Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/08/2009