There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

America's Wildlife Heritage Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To sustain fish, plants, and wildlife on America's public lands.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
06/22/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, Energy, and Research.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/22/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/15/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/15/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/10/2009Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
06/10/2009Referred to House Natural Resources
Action By: House of Representatives
06/10/2009Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/10/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/06/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/07/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/27/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/19/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/06/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/23/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources06/10/2009 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands06/15/2009 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife06/15/2009 Referred to
House Agriculture06/10/2009 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry06/22/2010 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, Energy, and Research06/22/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2807.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2807. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/10/2009)

America's Wildlife Heritage Act - Sets forth requirements concerning the maintenance of viable populations of existing native and desired non-native species within each planning area in the National Forest System's or the Bureau of Land Management's (BLM) public lands.

Directs the Secretary of Agriculture and the Secretary of the Interior to adopt and implement a strategically targeted monitoring program for determining the status and trends of native and desired non-native species populations on System and BLM lands. Defines: (1) native species to mean species of plants and animals indigenous to a planning area; and (2) desired non-native species to mean those wild species of plants and animals that are not indigenous to a planning area but are valued for their contribution to species diversity or their social, cultural, or economic value.

Requires the Secretaries to coordinate the management of planning areas of the System and the BLM with the management of the National Wildlife Refuge System and National Park System, other federal agencies, state fish and wildlife agencies, other state agencies responsible for management of natural resources, tribes, local governments, and non-governmental organizations engaged in species conservation.

Requires the Secretaries to issue regulations implementing this Act within one year of its enactment.