Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/15/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/06/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/06/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/07/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/15/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/23/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/27/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/28/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/19/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/03/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/09/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/22/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/14/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/14/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/14/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/06/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/18/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/23/2010