Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 06/10/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/24/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/24/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/27/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/30/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/28/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/14/2010