Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/09/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/15/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/27/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/08/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/18/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 12/07/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/19/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/14/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/28/2010