Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/12/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/15/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/26/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/01/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/07/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/26/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/29/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/29/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/02/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/07/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/19/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/02/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/12/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/22/2010