Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 01/13/2010