Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/20/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/29/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/26/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/26/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/13/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/27/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/22/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/03/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/16/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/12/2010