Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/11/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/11/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/11/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/11/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 06/11/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/17/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/25/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/14/2010