There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Architect of the Capitol Appointment Act of 2010

Short Titles as Reported to House

Architect of the Capitol Appointment Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Architect of the Capitol Appointment Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To provide for the joint appointment of the Architect of the Capitol by the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the President pro tempore of the Senate, the majority and minority leaders of the House of Representatives and Senate, the chair and ranking minority member of the Committee on House Administration of the House of Representatives, the chair and ranking minority member of the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure of the House of Representatives, the chair and ranking minority member of the Committee on Rules and Administration of the Senate, the chairs and ranking minority members of the Committees on Appropriations of the House of Representatives and Senate, and two other designated members of the Senate, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the joint appointment of the Architect of the Capitol by the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the President pro tempore of the Senate, the Majority and Minority Leaders of the House of Representatives and Senate, and the chairs and ranking minority members of the committees of Congress with jurisdiction over the Office of the Architect of the Capitol, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
02/03/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H480)
12/10/2009Committee on Transportation discharged.
12/10/2009Reported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 111-372, Part I.
06/12/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
02/04/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
02/03/2010-10:57amHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
02/03/2010-10:57amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/03/2010-10:57amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H480)
02/03/2010-10:45amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2843.
02/03/2010-10:45amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H480-482)
02/03/2010-10:45amHouseMs. Wasserman Schultz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/10/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 216.
12/10/2009HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
12/10/2009HouseReported by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 111-372, Part I.
11/04/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
11/04/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/15/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/12/2009HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/12/2009HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/12/2009HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/12/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/12/2009

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/12/2009 Referred to
11/04/2009 Markup by
12/10/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-372
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/12/2009 Referred to
12/10/2009 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management06/15/2009 Referred to
Senate Rules and Administration02/04/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2843. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/03/2010)

Architect of the Capitol Appointment Act of 2010 - Requires the Architect of the Capitol (AOC) to be appointed jointly by the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the President pro tempore of the Senate, the Majority and Minority Leaders of the House of Representatives and Senate, the chair and ranking Minority Member of the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, the chair and ranking Minority Member of the Senate Committee on Rules and Administration, the chair and ranking Minority Members of the congressional appropriations committees, a Member of the Senate designated by the Senate Majority Leader, and a Member of the Senate designated by the Senate Minority Leader.

Establishes a 10-year term for the AOC, as under current law, but permits additional reappointments.

Repeals the requirement of the Legislative Branch Appropriations Act, 1990 that the AOC be appointed by the President, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate.