Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/12/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/19/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/15/2009