Refine your search

13 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
03/18/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-147.
03/18/2010 Signed by President.
03/17/2010 Presented to President.
03/17/2010 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in the House amendment to the Senate amendment to the House amendment to the Senate amendment Yea-Nay Vote. 68 - 29. Record Vote Number: 55.
03/04/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendment to the House amendment to the Senate Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 217 - 201 (Roll no. 90).(text of House amendment to Senate amendment to House amendment to Senate amendment: CR H1136-1137)
02/24/2010 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in House amendment to Senate amendment with an amendment (SA 3310) Yea-Nay Vote. 70 - 28. Record Vote Number: 25.(consideration: CR S725; text as Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment: CR 2/25/2010 S804-815)
12/16/2009 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendment Agreed to by recorded vote: 217 - 212 (Roll no. 991).(text as House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment: CR H15443-15455)
11/05/2009 To conference: Senate insists on its amendment, asks for a conference, appoints conferees Mikulski; Inouye; Leahy; Kohl; Dorgan; Feinstein; Reed; Lautenberg; Nelson NE; Pryor; Byrd; Shelby; Gregg; McConnell; Hutchison; Alexander; Voinovich; Murkowski; Cochran.(consideration: CR S11186)
11/05/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 71 - 28. Record Vote Number: 340.(text: CR S11175-11186)
06/25/2009 Committee on Appropriations. Reported by Senator Mikulski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 111-34.
06/18/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 259 - 157 (Roll no. 408).
06/12/2009 The House Committee on Appropriations reported an original measure, H. Rept. 111-149, by Mr. Mollohan.
06/12/2009 Introduced in House