Limit your search

1-25 of 123
  1. S.Amdt.3521   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 03/15/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
  2. S.Amdt.3502 to S.Amdt.3501   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 03/11/2010) (Proposed 03/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/15/10 SA 3502 fell when SA 3501 fell.
  3. S.Amdt.3501   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 03/11/2010) (Proposed 03/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/15/10 SA 3501 fell when SA 3500 fell.
  4. S.Amdt.3500   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for a study.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 03/11/2010) (Proposed 03/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/15/10 SA 3500 fell when cloture was invoked on the motion to concur in the House amendments to Senate amendment to House amendment to Senate amendment.
  5. S.Amdt.3499 to S.Amdt.3498   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 03/11/2010) (Proposed 03/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/17/10 SA 3499 fell when SA 3498 withdrawn. (consideration: CR S1633)
  6. S.Amdt.3498   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] (Submitted 03/11/2010) (Proposed 03/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 03/17/10 Proposed amendment SA 3498 withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S1633)
  7. S.Amdt.3324 to S.Amdt.3310   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 02/23/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.3320 to S.Amdt.3310   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] (Submitted 02/22/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.3319 to S.Amdt.3310   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] (Submitted 02/22/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
  10. S.Amdt.3318   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 02/22/2010)
    Cosponsors: 17
  11. S.Amdt.3317   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 02/22/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.3316 to S.Amdt.3310   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 02/22/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.3315 to S.Amdt.3310   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] (Submitted 02/22/2010)
    Cosponsors: 1
  14. S.Amdt.3314 to S.Amdt.3313   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/11/2010) (Proposed 02/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/22/10 SA 3314 fell when SA 3313 fell.
  15. S.Amdt.3313   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: Of a perfecting nature.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/11/2010) (Proposed 02/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/22/10 SA 3313 fell when SA 3312 fell.
  16. S.Amdt.3312   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To provide for a study.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/11/2010) (Proposed 02/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/22/10 SA 3312 fell when cloture invoked on the motion to concur in the House amendment to the Senate amendment with an amendment (SA 3310).
  17. S.Amdt.3311 to S.Amdt.3310   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: To change the enactment date.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/11/2010) (Proposed 02/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/24/10 Proposed amendment SA 3311, by unanimous consent, was withdrawn in Senate. (consideration: CR S725)
  18. S.Amdt.3310   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: In the nature of a substitute.
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 02/11/2010) (Proposed 02/11/2010)
    Cosponsors: 0
    Latest Action: 02/24/10 Amendment SA 3310 agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 70 - 28. Record Vote Number: 25.
  19. S.Amdt.2728 to S.Amdt.2393   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] (Submitted 11/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  20. S.Amdt.2727   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] (Submitted 11/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  21. S.Amdt.2726   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] (Submitted 11/05/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  22. S.Amdt.2725   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/04/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  23. S.Amdt.2707   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] (Submitted 10/27/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0
  24. S.Amdt.2691   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] (Submitted 10/15/2009)
    Cosponsors: 2
  25. S.Amdt.2690   — 111th Congress (2009-2010)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] (Submitted 10/13/2009)
    Cosponsors: 0