Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/17/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/02/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/02/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/02/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/02/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/02/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/02/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/02/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/02/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/02/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/02/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/02/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/02/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/02/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/02/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/02/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/03/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/03/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/05/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/25/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/04/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/04/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/10/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/10/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/10/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/10/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/19/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/01/2010