There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

All-American Flag Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

All-American Flag Act

Short Titles as Introduced

All-American Flag Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the purchase of domestically made flags of the United States of America for use by the Federal Government.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/30/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7027)
09/14/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 111-586.
06/12/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/15/2010SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/30/2010-12:27amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/30/2010-12:27amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/28/2010 H7027)
09/30/2010-12:26amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7377-7378)
09/28/2010-2:14pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Bilbray objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/28/2010-1:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2853.
09/28/2010-1:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7027-7029)
09/28/2010-1:58pmHouseMr. Driehaus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/14/2010HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 336.
09/14/2010HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government. H. Rept. 111-586.
07/28/2010HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/28/2010HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/26/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
06/12/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
06/12/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (10)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Oversight and Government Reform06/12/2009 Referred to
07/28/2010 Markup by
09/14/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-586
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Government Management, Organization, and Procurement06/26/2009 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/15/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2853.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2853. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/30/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 14, 2010. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

All-American Flag Act - Requires any flags of the United States acquired for use by the federal government to be entirely manufactured in the United States from articles, materials, or supplies entirely grown, produced, or manufactured in the United States.

Permits the federal government to purchase flags only from a manufacturer that certifies that: (1) it does not employ aliens who are not authorized to be employed in the United States; and (2) it participates in the E-Verify Program.