Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/14/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/19/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/10/2010