Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/15/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/16/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/18/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/07/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/09/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/29/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/30/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/30/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/09/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/16/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/29/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/08/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/13/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/14/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/14/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 10/14/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/20/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/20/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/22/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/22/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/26/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/28/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/03/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/05/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/05/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/06/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/16/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 11/16/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 11/16/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/19/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/01/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/08/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 12/08/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/14/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/12/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/26/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/26/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/27/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/24/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/12/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/13/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/26/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/18/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/24/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/16/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/24/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/28/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/28/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/28/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/13/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/19/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 08/09/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/23/2010