Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/16/2010 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 111-370.
11/06/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 230 - 193 (Roll no. 875).
10/23/2009 Committee on Judiciary discharged.
10/23/2009 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-205, Part II.
07/13/2009 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 111-205, Part I.
06/15/2009 Introduced in House