Committees: H.R.2868 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/15/2009 Referred to
07/13/2009 Reported by House Report 111-205,Part 1
06/16/2009 Hearings by
06/23/2009 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce06/15/2009 Referred to
10/23/2009 Reported by House Report 111-205,Part 2
10/21/2009 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Environment06/16/2009 Referred to
10/14/2009 Reported by
10/14/2009 Markup by
10/01/2009 Hearings by
House Judiciary07/13/2009 Referred to
10/23/2009 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs11/09/2009 Referred to
12/16/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-370
03/03/2010 Hearings by
07/28/2010 Markup by