Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/21/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/21/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/21/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/22/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/28/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/17/2010