There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Detainee Photographic Records Protection Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide that certain photographic records relating to the treatment of any individual engaged, captured, or detained after September 11, 2001, by the Armed Forces of the United States in operations outside the United States shall not be subject to disclosure under section 552 of title 5, United States Code (commonly referred to as the Freedom of Information Act).


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/15/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/15/2009Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2009Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2009Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/15/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 06/15/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/19/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/19/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/19/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/19/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/19/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/19/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/19/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/19/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/19/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 06/19/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/23/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform06/15/2009 Referred to
House Armed Services06/15/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2875. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/2009)

Detainee Photographic Records Protection Act of 2009 - Requires the Secretary of Defense to: (1) submit a certification to the President for any photograph taken between September 11, 2001, and January 22, 2009, that relates to the treatment of individuals engaged, captured, or detained after September 11, 2001, by the U.S. Armed Forces in operations outside of the United States if the Secretary determines that disclosure of such photograph would endanger U.S. citizens or members of the Armed Forces or U.S. government employees deployed outside the United States; and (2) submit timely notice of such certification to Congress.

Authorizes the Secretary to submit a renewal of a certification at any time. Provides that a certification or a renewal shall expire after three years.

Exempts such a certified photograph from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), but does not preclude voluntary disclosure.