Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 06/15/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 10/01/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 10/29/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/10/2010