Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/16/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 06/16/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/16/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/16/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/16/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/26/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/15/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/29/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/17/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/15/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/26/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/05/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/05/2009