Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/25/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/22/2010