Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/13/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/14/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/21/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/02/2009