Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/17/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/17/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 06/17/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/19/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/19/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/07/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/07/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/15/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/15/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/22/2009