Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 06/17/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/10/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/01/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/14/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/14/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/19/2010