Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/09/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/28/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/17/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/30/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/30/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/30/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/14/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/14/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/28/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/27/2010