Refine your search

Showing 9 of 9 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/22/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-324.
12/22/2010 Signed by President.
12/17/2010 Presented to President.
12/16/2010 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H8541-8543; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8541)
12/10/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8809; text as passed Senate: CR S8809)
12/06/2010 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Harkin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/30/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7194)
09/28/2010 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-635.
06/18/2009 Introduced in House