Committees: H.R.2941 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/18/2009 Referred to
09/23/2010 Markup by
09/28/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-635
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/19/2009 Referred to
09/15/2010 Hearings by
09/16/2010 Markup by
09/16/2010 Reported by
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions11/15/2010 Referred to
12/01/2010 Markup by
12/06/2010 Reported by