Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/14/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/23/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/24/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/24/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/24/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/24/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/24/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/24/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/24/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/15/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/18/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/16/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/26/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/26/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/22/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 09/22/2010