Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/23/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/04/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/21/2009