Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/18/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/24/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/14/2009