Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/08/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/08/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/09/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/13/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/27/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/27/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/19/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/09/2010