Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/24/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/07/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/20/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/28/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/29/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/09/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/22/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/23/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/06/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 10/06/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 10/06/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/08/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/08/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 10/08/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/08/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/08/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/08/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/08/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 10/13/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/15/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/20/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/21/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/26/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/29/2010