Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/19/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/19/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/08/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/08/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2010