Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 06/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/09/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/10/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/13/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/14/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/20/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/22/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/22/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/30/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/30/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/15/2010