Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/14/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/14/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/14/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/14/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 01/14/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/14/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/14/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/14/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/14/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/14/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/14/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/14/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 01/14/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/14/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/14/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/14/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/14/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/14/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/14/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/14/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/27/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/12/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/09/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/02/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 07/14/2010