Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/20/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/20/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/02/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 12/09/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/14/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/14/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/12/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/19/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/19/2010