Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/25/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/25/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/22/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/24/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/24/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/24/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/24/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/24/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/24/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/24/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/24/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/24/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/24/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/24/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/24/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/24/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/24/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/06/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/19/2010