Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/10/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/28/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/01/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/01/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/01/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/01/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/01/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/01/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/01/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/08/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/08/2009