Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 06/24/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/09/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/09/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/01/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/01/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/08/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/08/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/19/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/20/2010