Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/03/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/10/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/10/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/10/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/13/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/03/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/06/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/06/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/06/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/09/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/11/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/11/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 03/25/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 04/02/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/27/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/27/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/04/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/04/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/20/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/02/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/02/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/03/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/08/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/08/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/11/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/23/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/24/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/08/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/08/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/22/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/30/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/10/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/10/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/15/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/15/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/22/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/30/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 09/30/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/21/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/21/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/21/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/04/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/01/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 01/27/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/23/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/24/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/20/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/20/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/23/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 09/15/2010