Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/26/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 07/30/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/31/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/23/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/01/2010