Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/26/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/07/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/07/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/07/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/07/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/07/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/10/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 07/13/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/14/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/14/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/14/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/15/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/16/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/16/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/20/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/20/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/21/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/23/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/23/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/24/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/28/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/28/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/29/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/30/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/31/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/08/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/22/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/08/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/19/2010