Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/08/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/08/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/08/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/23/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/30/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/14/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/21/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/22/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/22/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/06/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/06/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/06/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/06/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/06/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/06/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/06/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/21/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/21/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/07/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/07/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/08/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/08/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/08/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/19/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/19/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/02/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/02/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/24/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/24/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/24/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/24/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/24/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 02/24/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/03/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/09/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/14/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/14/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/14/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/20/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/27/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/11/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/11/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/11/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/22/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/01/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/01/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/15/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/29/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/29/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/29/2010