Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/09/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/09/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/09/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/09/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/09/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/09/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/10/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/10/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 07/10/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/15/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 07/15/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/20/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/20/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/20/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/22/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/22/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/22/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/27/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/27/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/27/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/27/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/30/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/30/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/30/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/30/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/30/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/30/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/31/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 09/08/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/08/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/08/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/08/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 09/08/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/08/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/14/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/14/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/14/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/14/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/24/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/24/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 09/24/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/24/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/24/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/01/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/01/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/01/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/01/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/01/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/08/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 10/15/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/23/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/23/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/23/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/23/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/23/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/07/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/07/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/07/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/28/2010