Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 06/25/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/25/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/25/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/07/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/08/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/10/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/17/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/17/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/26/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/27/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/04/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/23/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/29/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 08/10/2010