Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/07/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/14/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/26/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/06/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/22/2010