Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/22/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/22/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/26/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 01/26/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 01/28/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/28/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/04/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/09/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/12/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/12/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/12/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/12/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/12/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/12/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/12/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/23/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/23/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/09/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/16/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/22/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/05/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/19/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/02/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/15/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/21/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/30/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/20/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/20/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/23/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/23/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/28/2010